skip to content

Levin, David Neville

CPSO#: 98310

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Avenue
Deptartment of Anesthesia and
Pain Medicine
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto ON  M4J 1H7
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 202929 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David N. Levin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Levin ( CPSO# 98310 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1H7
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID NEVILLE LEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017