skip to content

Levesque, Mikael Rene Lionel

CPSO#: 101004

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
430 Notre Dame Avenue
Suite 102
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K7
Phone: (705) 222-7342
Fax: (705) 222-7341 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mikael R. L. Levesque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levesque ( CPSO# 101004)

Business Address:
102 - 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 222-7342

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIKAEL RENE LIONEL LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015