skip to content

Leung, Wesley Daryl Chung Yin

CPSO#: 85112

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 317
2863 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-3577
Fax: (416) 281-7666 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Wesley Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leung ( CPSO# 85112 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 281-3577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WESLEY DARYL CHUNG YIN LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010