skip to content

Leung, Koon Chit Lawrence

CPSO#: 86873

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Cambridge, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Agape Integrated Clinic
Unit 4
4188 Spratt Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Z6
Phone: 613-425-6888
Fax: 613-425-5888 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K.C.L. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leung ( CPSO# 86873 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
2430 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone Number: (613) 736-6946

Business Address:
Unit 4
4188 Spratt Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Z6
Phone Number: 613-425-6888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KOON CHIT LAWRENCE LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012