skip to content

Leung, Jessica Ellen

CPSO#: 85055

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jessica Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 25 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services, 111 St Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 28 Feb 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Feb 2017