skip to content

Leung, James Sze-Chuck

CPSO#: 90741

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences Centre, Room 2R104
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street W
Hamilton, ON L8S4K1
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone: (905)521-2100 Ext. 75155
Fax: 905-570-8992 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Sze-Chuck Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung ( CPSO# 90741 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Room 2N491
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:05 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES SZE-CHUCK LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
EL - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015