skip to content

Leung, Grace Sin Yee

CPSO#: 93024

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 May 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6580 Ext. 3721
Fax: 416-469-6022 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

South East Toronto FHT
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Canada
Phone: 416-469-6464
Fax: 416-469-6164
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Carefirst Specialist Clinic
Scarborough site
2nd Floor
300 Silver Star Blvd
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2
Canada
Phone: (416) 847-8940
Fax: 416-646-5109
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Grace Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Leung ( CPSO# 93024 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Carefirst Specialist Clinic
300 Silver Star Boulevard
2nd Floor
Scarborough ON  M1V 0G2
Phone Number: (416) 847-8940

Business Address:
Carefirst Specialist Clinic
Suite 206
420 Highway #7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3K2
Phone Number: (905) 695-0901

Business Address:
South East Toronto Family Health Team
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 469-6464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GRACE SIN YEE LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 21 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 21 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016