skip to content

Leung, Eric Wing-On

CPSO#: 86310

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre
T-Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6165
Fax: (416) 480-6002 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tran Le and Dr. Eric Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leung ( CPSO# 86310 )
Dr. T. Le ( CPSO# 91592 )

Business Address:
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 221
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
T Wing
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6165

Business Address:
7 Elmwood Avenue
North York ON  M2N 6R6

Business Address:
400-2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
C2-2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2
Phone Number: (416) 792-3043

Business Address:
3276 St Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: 416-285-3666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC WING-ON LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2012