skip to content

Leung, Edmond Yiu-Hang

CPSO#: 30869

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dragon City X-ray & Ultrasound
Toronto ON  M5T 3A5
Phone: (416) 603-1197
Fax: (416) 603-1199 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Edmond Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Leung ( CPSO# 30869 )

Business Address:
306 - 280 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 3A5
Phone Number: (416) 603-1197

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDMOND YIU-HANG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1984