skip to content

Leung, Christina Chi Wai

CPSO#: 85046

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: 705-418-0255
Fax: 888-321-8445 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

198 - 2224 Walker Rd
Windsor ON  L4N 8X3
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Suite 2
382 West Street N
Orillia ON  L3V 5E6
Canada
Phone: 705-418-0255
Fax: 888-321-8445
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Suite 204
500 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Canada
Phone: 705-797-1700
Fax: 705-797-1800
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christina Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leung ( CPSO# 85046 )

Business Address:
2224 Walker Road
Suite 198
Windsor ON  N8W 3P6
Phone Number: (519) 252-2020

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 206
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 418-0255

Business Address:
384 West Street North
Suite 2
Orillia ON  L3V 5E6
Phone Number: (705) 418-0255

Business Address:
500 Huronia Road
Suite 204
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Phone Number: (705) 797-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA CHI WAI LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011