skip to content

Leung, Cheryl Sze Yiu

CPSO#: 86586

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Riverdale Community
Health Centre
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone: (416) 461-2493
Fax: (416) 461-8245 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

E W Bickle Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R8
Canada
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 2825
Fax: 416-531-4774
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cheryl S.Y. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leung ( CPSO# 86586 )

Business Address:
E.W. Bickle Cnetre
Toronto Rhabilitation Institute
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 2R8
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERYL SZE YIU LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2010