skip to content

Letts, Robert Mervyn

CPSO#: 21796

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario, 401 Smyth Road, Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 05 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Mar 2015