skip to content

Letovsky, Eric

CPSO#: 31299

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jan 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Letovsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 30 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC LETOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1980