skip to content

Lester, Michael Leon

CPSO#: 19581

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatric Urgent Care
Suite C107
3885 Duke Of York Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4
Phone: 905 366 4441 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Absolute Pediatric Urgent Care
Unit 1
50 Absolute Ave.
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0A8
Canada
Phone: 905 897 5437
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 04 Jan 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LEON LESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 28, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)