Leslie, Robert James (CPSO#: 98993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: 7057282280
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES LESLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESLIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017