Lesieur, Martin (CPSO#: 100177)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sunnybrook Health Science Centre Office MG 301 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 29 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2014