skip to content

Leroux, Timothy Sean

CPSO#: 90830

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 1 East 436
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6286 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Timothy S. Leroux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Leroux ( CPSO# 90830 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
63 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 1 East 436
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6286

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY SEAN LEROUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEROUX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016