skip to content

Lerman, Jerrold

CPSO#: 30903

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
John R. Oishei Children's Hospital
1001 Main St, Suite K-3502
Buffalo NY  14203
United States
Phone: (716) 323-6570
Fax: (716) 323-6658

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JERROLD LERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983