skip to content

Leonard, Brian Clark

CPSO#: 23552

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8574
Fax: (613) 739-6645 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Leonard ( CPSO# 23552 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8574

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN CLARK LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1976