Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Oct 2020
Summary:
On June 26, 2019, allegations of Dr. Herman’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that in or about 1997, Dr. Herman engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards a patient, who was a teenager at the time.
The matter was heard on October 28, 2020, by way of videoconference, in the presence of counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Herman. On the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Leon Herman committed an act of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient; and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practise of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Disposition
On October 29, 2020, the Discipline Committee issued its Order directing that:
- the Registrar revoke Dr. Herman’s certificate of registration effective immediately;
- Dr. Herman appear before the panel to be reprimanded;
- Dr. Herman reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within thirty (30) days of this order in the amount of $16,060.00; and
- Dr. Herman pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
On January 19, 2021, the Committee released its reasons for decision. The reasons may be viewed on the website of the College.