skip to content

Leon, Chloe Marie

CPSO#: 86346

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102-1155 Queen St W
CAMH
Slaight Centre
4th floor
Phone: 416-535-8501

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Canada
Phone: (416) 260-4147
Fax: (416) 971-7172
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CMHA
700 Lawrence Ave West, Suite 480
Toronto ON  M6A 3B4
Canada
Phone: (416) 789-7957
Fax: 416.789.9079
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Chloe Leon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Leon ( CPSO# 86346 )

Business Address:
480 - 700 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B4
Phone Number: (416) 789-7957

Business Address:
200 - 455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone Number: (416) 260-4147

Business Address:
250 College Street
7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHLOE MARIE LEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012