skip to content

Lennox, Genevieve Kathleen

CPSO#: 93312

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W.
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905)8132200 Ext. 1841
Fax: (905)8134024 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE KATHLEEN LENNOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENNOX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2018