skip to content

Lennox, Bruce Martin

CPSO#: 19281

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bruce M. Lennox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 244 Riverview Boulevard Street St Catharines, ON L2T 3M8
Instructions: Patients may send a signed request to Dr. Lennox at above address.
Date Received: 07 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015