skip to content

Lenk, Czeslaw Romuald

CPSO#: 15098

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 1939

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1990
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.