skip to content

Lenehan, John Gordon

CPSO#: 90505

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010, Stn B, Room A3-939
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8808 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Gordon Lenehan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lenehan ( CPSO# 90505 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
A3-939
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:29 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN GORDON LENEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENEHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Medical Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2015