skip to content

Leiter, Lawrence Alan

CPSO#: 29253

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
61 Queen Street East
Suite 6121 Q
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7441
Fax: (416) 867-3696 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Leiter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Leiter ( CPSO# 29253 )

Business Address:
Suite 6-121
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7441

Business Address:
61 Queen St. East #6121
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ALAN LEITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEITER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977