skip to content

Leitenberg, Samuel

CPSO#: 27531

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 16-Jun-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions, 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 29 Apr 2015


Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Telephone: 416-781-9083 or Toll free 1-888-297-781-9083 Fax 1-866-297-9338 Website: www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 13 Dec 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015