skip to content

Leis, Karen Sophie

CPSO#: 86066

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Department of Pediatrics Royal University Hospital 103 Hospital Drive Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 0W8
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2007 to 04 May 2007
EL - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2010