Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Jun 2001
Summary:
On June 22, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Leibl guilty of professional misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in regard to the therapy he provided to patients, improperly used his authority to prescribe or dispense a drug and prescribed and dispensed drugs to a patient for an improper purpose. Dr. Leibl was also found guilty of professional misconduct with respect to engaging in sexual impropriety with a patient and verbally and physically abusing a patient. Dr. Leibl failed to maintain the patient records a physician is required to maintain and falsified a record regarding an examination or treatment of a patient; all of this to be considered a display of disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct unbecoming a physican. Dr.Leibl was found to be incompetent.
Having heard a motion for adjournment of the penalty hearing, the Discipline Committee ordered as a condition of his certificate of registration, that Dr. Leibl(s certificate of registration be suspended effective Tuesday, July 24, 2001, at 12:01 a.m. until the disposition of the penalty hearing is disposed of.
On September 20, 2001, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Leibl be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Register and that his certificate of registration be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-09-17
Hearing Date(s): Dec 11, 2000