skip to content

Lega, Iliana Carolina

CPSO#: 92255

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Nov 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. I. Lega Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Lega ( CPSO# 92255 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
6th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:15 Nov 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ILIANA CAROLINA LEGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2009