skip to content

Lefebvre, Paul

CPSO#: 29056

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:26 Nov 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 1999