skip to content

Lefebvre, Guy Robert Bernard

CPSO#: 24862

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 May 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Nov 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 May 1983