skip to content

Lee-Evoy, Janet Catherine

CPSO#: 100682

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Janet Lee-Evoy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee-Evoy ( CPSO# 100682)

Business Address:
Women's Hospital College
76 Grenville Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANET CATHERINE LEE-EVOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE-EVOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018