skip to content

Lee, Wilson James

CPSO#: 13044

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1949 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1950
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Mar 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1986