skip to content

Lee, William Leslie

CPSO#: 21538

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 2013

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 18, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Lee was subject to an investigation by the College. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Lee resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.