skip to content

Lee, Tsu-Yee Joseph

CPSO#: 91905

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Surrey Memorial Hospital
13750 - 96 Ave
Surrey BC  V3V 1Z2
Phone: 604-585-5666

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: TY Joseph Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TSU-YEE JOSEPH LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014