skip to content

Lee, Stella

CPSO#: 89828

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mezzanine
396 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone: (416) 928-9343
Fax: (416) 928-9368 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Harvey H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wong ( CPSO# 82602 )
Dr. S. Lee ( CPSO# 89828 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4758

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Bond Wing
Room 6044
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6059

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STELLA LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008