Lee, Seung-Jun (CPSO#: 98586)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Primary Care
Collaborative Memory Clinic
6th Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 284-6168
Fax: (416) 673-9369
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seung Jun Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lee ( CPSO# 98586 )

Business Address:
East GTA Family Health Team
6th Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 284-6168

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEUNG-JUN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014