skip to content

Lee, Sai-Ping

CPSO#: 26283

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Dec 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sai Ping Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: 1483 Gerrard St. E. Toronto, ON M4L 2A4
Date Received: 26 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:15 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020