Lee, Pei Ying Christine (CPSO#: 99379)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 19 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2013 to 13 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2012