skip to content

Lee, Paul Kin Pong

CPSO#: 97611

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kawaguchi Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kawaguchi ( CPSO# 97851 )
Dr. P. Lee ( CPSO# 97611 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL KIN PONG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016