skip to content

Lee, Oscar Ignatius

CPSO#: 23765

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Dec 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients may obtain their records by contacting RSRS Patient Support at: 1-888-563-3732, ext. 1 or 416-398-0638, ext. 1.
Date Received: 27 Nov 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Dec 2018