skip to content

Lee, Michael Shun Wai

CPSO#: 26812

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 27-Mar-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 403 265 Yorkland Boulevard Toronto, ON M2J 5C7 Tel: 416 229 2399 Fax: 416 229 9771
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Pare for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 20 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:19 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2016