skip to content

Lee, Michael Hunsu

CPSO#: 95969

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705)728-9090 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 95969 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HUNSU LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2015