skip to content

Lee, King Tak

CPSO#: 31405

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Dec 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1980
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
3850 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T6
Phone: (416) 293-6333 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K.T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lee ( CPSO# 31405 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
3850 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T6
Phone Number: (416) 293-6333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KING TAK LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1980

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Feb 1990
Summary:

 In the course of a Hearing which began in November 1989, Dr. Lee pleaded guilty to a charge of 
 professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as 
 amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  
 The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and in February 1990 found Dr. Lee guilty of 
 professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Lee be reprimanded, with 
 the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be 
 suspended for a period of one month.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Nov 1989