skip to content

Lee, Kenneth

CPSO#: 98190

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lee ( CPSO# 98190 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenueeast
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: 6472919822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KENNETH LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017