skip to content

Lee, June Joo-Hyun

CPSO#: 89332

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Lakeshore Road, Suite 5
St Catharines ON  L2N 7E4
Phone: 905-937-2220
Fax: 905-937-4404 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. C. Durant & J. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Durant ( CPSO# 89081 )
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 89332 )

Business Address:
464 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Phone Number: (905) 984-6402

Business Address:
2 Lakeshore Road
Suite 5
St Catharines ON  L2N 7E4
Phone Number: (905) 937-2220

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUNE JOO-HYUN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2013