skip to content

Lee, John J

CPSO#: 92556

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
529 Wilson Heights Blvd
Toronto ON  M3H 2V7
Phone: (647) 340-6700
Fax: (647) 340-6701 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2444 Hurontario St
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

20 Drewry Ave
Toronto ON  M2M 1C8
Canada
Phone: 6473406700
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1640 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 1A7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John J. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 92556 )

Business Address:
20 Drewry Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 1C8

Business Address:
529 Wilson Heights Blvd
Toronto ON  M3H 2V7
Phone Number: 6473406700

Business Address:
2444 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:30 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN J LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2011