Lee, Ji Young Jennifer (CPSO#: 100361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Rheumatology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7707
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 654-5437
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 10 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JI YOUNG JENNIFER LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2017