skip to content

Lee, James Livingstone

CPSO#: 24750

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James L. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Heritz 180 Vine Street South St Catharines ON L2R 7P3
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017